United States of America v. Valko DeSantis et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Erin Rose Valko DeSantis, Erin DeSantis Kneer, Joseph Valko, Douglas Scott Kneer and Erin R. DeSantis
Case Number: 6:2020cv00055
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Erin R. DeSantis, Erin Rose Valko DeSantis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plea Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment, #3 Exhibit C - Restitution Order, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Sale of Home)(Dean, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Marshal's Return of service of Summons & Complaint on 9/22/2020 upon Douglas Scott Kneer Executed. Douglas Scott Kneer served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020.(al)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Defendants shall have until September 23, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Erin R. DeSantis, Erin Rose Valko DeSantis answer due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/10/2020. (al)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Erin R. DeSantis, Erin Rose Valko DeSantis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Edwin Dean, II on behalf of Erin R. DeSantis, Erin Rose Valko DeSantis (Dean, Robert)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to Douglas Scott Kneer. (Attachment: #1 USM-285)(ca)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Douglas S. Kneer by United States of America (Frith, Krista) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/3/2020) (al). Modified on 9/3/2020 Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document(al).
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Marshal's Return of service of Summons & Complaint upon Douglas Scott Kneer - Returned UNEXECUTED. (ca)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 Marshal's Return of service of Summons & Complaint on 8/26/2020 upon Joseph Valko, Erin Rose Valko DeSantis, as Trustee of the Erin R. DeSantis Revocable Trust Dated January 7, 2010, and Erin Rose Valko DeSantis - Executed. Erin R. DeSantis served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020; Joseph Valko served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020; Erin Rose Valko DeSantis served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020.(ca)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Erin R. DeSantis, Douglas Scott Kneer, Joseph Valko, Erin Rose Valko DeSantis NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Trust, #2 Summons Issued Valko, #3 Summons Issued Kneer)(dg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Erin R. DeSantis, Douglas Scott Kneer, Joseph Valko, Erin Rose Valko DeSantis, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Valko DeSantis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Rose Valko DeSantis
Represented By: Robert Edwin Dean, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin DeSantis Kneer
Represented By: Robert Edwin Dean, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Valko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Scott Kneer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin R. DeSantis
Represented By: Robert Edwin Dean, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Krista Consiglio Frith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?