Rudin v. Duncan et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Rudin
Defendant: Shipyourcarnow, LLC, George Duncan, III, Foreign Autos, Inc. doing business as Precision Auto Sales, Jamaal R. Nelson, Ox Towing, LLC and Marvel Auto Transport, LLC
Case Number: 6:2021cv00018
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Cancellation of Jury Trial set for September 12 - 14, 2022. (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (ca)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO REMAND CASE to the Circuit Court for the City of Richmond. For the reasons set forth herein, the Court holds that this case shall be and hereby is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the City of Richmond. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to strike this case from the Court's active docket, and to TERMINATE all pending motions. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on May 11, 2021. (ca)
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #10 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Cynthia Rudin. (Yakubisin, Christopher)
April 27, 2021 Filing 14 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shipyourcarnow, LLC (Boyce, David)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Gregory Boyce on behalf of Shipyourcarnow, LLC (Boyce, David)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Convert Demurrer to Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Shipyourcarnow, LLC. (Boyce, David) Modified on 4/28/2021 - Docket text was modified to reflect the correct docket entry. (ca)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 Brief / Memorandum in Support of #10 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shipyourcarnow, LLC. (Boyce, David) Modified on 4/28/2021 - Docket text was modified to reflect the correct docket entry. (ca)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Shipyourcarnow, LLC. (Boyce, David)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #7 State Court Record at pages# 36-39 by George Duncan, III, Ox Towing, LLC and Jamaal R. Nelson. (al)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #7 State Court Record at pages# 28-29 by Foreign Autos, Inc. d/b/a Precision Auto Sales. (al)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court of the City of Richmond, CL21000937-5, consisting of 1 Envelope, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(al)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for September 12 - 14, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Lynchburg before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ca)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on April 15, 2021. (ca) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/15/2021 with filed stamp version; NEF regenerated.) (ca)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Circuit Court for the City of Richmond re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jamaal R. Nelson, Ox Towing, LLC, George Duncan, III. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 4/8/2021. (al)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ox Towing, LLC (Keeney, Carter)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (al)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of Richmond, case number CL21-937-5. (Filing & Administrative fee $402, receipt number BVAWDC-3669952), filed by George Duncan, III, Jamaal R. Nelson, Ox Towing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - George Duncan, III, Ox Towing, LLC & Jamaal R. Nelson State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Foreign Autos, Inc State Court Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(al)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudin v. Duncan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shipyourcarnow, LLC
Represented By: David Gregory Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Duncan, III
Represented By: Carter Taliaferro Keeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foreign Autos, Inc. doing business as Precision Auto Sales
Represented By: Virginia McNeill Poindexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamaal R. Nelson
Represented By: Carter Taliaferro Keeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ox Towing, LLC
Represented By: Carter Taliaferro Keeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Auto Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Rudin
Represented By: Christopher P Yakubisin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?