McLaurin v. Liberty University
Plaintiff: LeeQuan McLaurin
Defendant: Liberty University
Case Number: 6:2021cv00038
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Jay D. Ellwanger to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on September 7, 2021. (ca)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for David W. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on September 7, 2021. (ca)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty University (Stiegler, Leah)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Jay D. Ellwanger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3775232. by LeeQuan McLaurin. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (DiMuro, Bernard)
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for David W. Henderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3775228. by LeeQuan McLaurin. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (DiMuro, Bernard)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on August 25, 2021. (ca)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by King Fitchett Tower on behalf of Liberty University (Tower, King)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint by Liberty University.(Stiegler, Leah)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Liberty University NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(al)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty University (Filing & Administrative fee $402, receipt # AVAWDC-3746498), filed by LeeQuan McLaurin. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(al)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaurin v. Liberty University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeeQuan McLaurin
Represented By: Bernard Joseph DiMuro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty University
Represented By: King Fitchett Tower
Represented By: Leah Michele Stiegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?