Olsen v. Angelone
Case Number: 7:2001cv00310
Filed: November 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 84 Motion to Show Prejudice from Counsel's Admitted Professional Deficiencies; dismissing 85 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 87 Motion to Show; Respondent's Motion to Dismiss; Petitioner's State Habeas Petition, was very Misleading and Constituted Fraud on the Court; Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/27/2018. (tvt)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 79 Motion for reconsideration; Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/13/2017. (tvt)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 73 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 73 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 74 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; denying 75 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 4/28/2017. (tvt)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying 66 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 67 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/14/2016. (tvt)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 53 Motion for Reconsideration ; dismissing 54 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; dismissing 55 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/9/2015. (tvt)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/12/2014. (kab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olsen v. Angelone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?