Riches v. Swartz et al Featured Case

Plaintiff charges that \"Jon Swartz USA Today cardcops.com\" is a reporter that writes about cybercrime. Plaintiff alleges that defendant entraps people by revealing how to commit identity theft in his articles, which then encourages people to commit cybercrime. Defendant allegedly then reports such crimes to the FBI for whistleblowing money.

Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Defendant: Jon Swartz, Ed Mierzwinski, creditcards.com, Phishing and World Wide Web
Case Number: 7:2007cv00379
Filed: August 7, 2007
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Michael F. Urbanski
Presiding Judge: Samuel G. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2007 8
USCA Notice of intent to dismiss (kab)
August 27, 2007 7
USCA Notice of appellant needing to pay filing and dockting fee to the Clerk. (kab)
August 22, 2007 5
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re 4 Notice of Appeal NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order forms are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If applicable, the original CJA24(s) will be mailed directly to you by the District Court. (tvt)
August 13, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, denying all pending motions as moot, and striking this case from the active docket of the court. Signed by Judge Samuel G. Wilson on 8/13/2007. (kab )
August 7, 2007 1
COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against all defendants (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Jonathan Lee Riches.(tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riches v. Swartz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lee Riches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Mierzwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: creditcards.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phishing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Wide Web
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?