Turner v. Digital Broadcast Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Steven E. Turner
Defendant: Zapmytv.com, Inc. and Digital Broadcast Corporation
Case Number: 7:2010cv00559
Filed: December 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Michael F. Urbanski
Presiding Judge: Samuel G. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Samuel G. Wilson on 05/24/2012. (rkc)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing the Clerk to file the billing records under seal. Signed by Judge Samuel G. Wilson on 01/05/2012. (rkc)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 32 Motion for Leave to Appeal; denying 24 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Samuel G. Wilson on 07/08/2011. (rkc)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Samuel G. Wilson on 05/20/2011. (rkc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Digital Broadcast Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zapmytv.com, Inc.
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Broadcast Corporation
Represented By: John Thomas Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E. Turner
Represented By: Nicholas Allen Kurtz
Represented By: David Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?