Collier v. Land & Sea Restaurant Company, LLC

Case Number: 7:2013cv00104
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Turk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2015 415 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/26/15. (eot)
October 16, 2015 412 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/16/15. (eot)
August 13, 2015 370 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/13/15. (eot)
October 15, 2014 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/15/2014. (ssm)
July 21, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 07/21/2014. (ssm)
January 28, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 62 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Turk on 1/27/14. (sas)
September 18, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss Claim of Common Law Indemnity Asserted in Fourth Party Complaint of Performance Food Group, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Turk on 9/18/13. (sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. Land & Sea Restaurant Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?