Hinton v. O'Conner, et al.

Case Number: 7:2014cv00197
Filed: April 24, 2014
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
Referring Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Michael F. Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as moot 50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 6/20/2016. (slt)
May 27, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Case is stricken from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/27/2016. (slt) Modified on 5/27/2016 (slt).
February 19, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/19/2016. (slt)
July 9, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all claims except 1(III), (VII), and (VIII) are Dismissed for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and all defendants except for Officers Anderson, Mullen nd Profit are TERMINATED. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 7/9/2015. (tvt)
June 10, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 6/10/2014. (tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinton v. O'Conner, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?