Kinard v. Holloway et al

Case Number: 7:2014cv00230
Filed: May 6, 2014
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
Referring Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: James P. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 07/28/2014. (kab)
September 18, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 09/18/2014. (kab)
October 22, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 10/22/2014. (tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinard v. Holloway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.