Muhammad v. Commonwealth Of Virginia et al
Case Number: 7:2014cv00529
Filed: September 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting 175 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 207 Report and Recommendations; adopting 208 Report and Recommendations; denying 210 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 213 Motion for Reconsideration; the clerk sha ll SCHEDULE this matter for a trial before a seven-member advisory jury as to Claim 5 and the defendants are PROHIBITED from putting on specific evidence as directed within this order. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/27/2017. (tvt)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER regarding Proposed Order to Show Cause 188 filed by Abdul-Hamza Wali Muhammad. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 6/13/2016. (tvt)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Dismiss; denying 146 Motion for Sanctions; denying 147 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; denying 152 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 157 Report and Recommendations for 157 Report and Recommendations, ; denying 159 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; denying 166 Motion for Settlement. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 3/17/2016. (tvt)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 5/7/2015. (tvt)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 OPINION AND ORDER denying 105 Motion for TRO. Signed by Chief United States District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 4/6/2015. (tvt)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying 75 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; denying 78 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; denying 79 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 82 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; denying 84 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; denying 86 Motion for TRO; denying 87 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 89 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; denying 90 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; denying 91 Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion; defenants are DIRECTED to file any motion for summary judgment in response to plaintiff's claims in the first amended complaint within 30 days from the entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/27/2015. (tvt)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 01/26/2015. (kab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Commonwealth Of Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?