Portis v. Ruan Transportation Management Systems, Inc.

Case Number: 7:2015cv00118
Filed: March 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/19/2016. (am)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 4/4/2016. (bw)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/1/2015. (lab)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 6/26/2015. (lab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portis v. Ruan Transportation Management Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?