Branham v. Parker et al

Case Number: 7:2015cv00351
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
Referring Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Jackson L. Kiser
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failure to prosecutepursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 6/29/2016. (slt)
March 28, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss; defendants shall, within sixty days, file a motion for summary judgment supported by affidavit(s). Signed by Senior United States District Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 3/28/2016. (tvt)
July 24, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that any claims against the Blue Ridge Jail or Blue Ridge Jail Administration are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 7/24/2015. (tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branham v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?