Morris v. Fletcher et al
Case Number: 7:2015cv00675
Filed: December 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER overruling objections to R&R 264 ; adopting the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 262 ; granting Defendant's motions for summary judgment 230 , 232 , 241 and denying Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 239 . The clerk is directed to remove this matter from the active docket. (Order and/or Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 5/2/2018. (slt)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting 230 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 232 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 239 Motion for summary judgment; granting 241 Motion for Summary Judgment adopting 262 Report and Recommendations (Order mailed to Pro Se Party);. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/5/2018. (tvt)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying 88 Motion Qualified Immunity. Dr. Smith also filed two motions for summary judgment which I will address by separate order. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/27/2017. (tvt)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/24/2017. (slt)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 141 ; denying 52 Motion for preliminary injunctive relief; denying 70 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 80 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 82 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 111 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 117 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 119 Motion for preliminary injunctive relief; denying 126 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/13/2017. (tvt)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order to Respond-defendant Dr. Smith is hereby DIRECTED to file a motion for summary judgment supported by affidavits. Responses due by 8/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/29/2016. (slt)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/11/2016. (slt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Fletcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?