Hoglan v. Robinson
Case Number: 7:2015cv00694
Filed: December 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Jackson L. Kiser
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 105 Motion for Reconsideration; Certificate of Appealability is DENIED; and this action is stricken from the active docket (Opinion and Order mailed to Pro Se Party). Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 3/30/2018. (tvt)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment as to qualified immunity; denying 63 Motion for adjudication sequence; denying 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to qualified immunity ; denying 66 Motion to Strike ; denying 70 Motion for Summary Judgment as to qualified immunity; the parties' motions for summary judgment in other respects are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 3/21/2017. (tvt)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 43 Motion for prisoner correspondence; granting 44 Motion to Amend/Correct to the extent defendant Melissa Welch is TERMINATED and PRC Member Number 1 is JOINED; granting 57 Motion for Protective Order as to the third set of int errogatories; denying 59 Motion to electronically file; denying 33 Motion to Amend/Correct; and Plaintiff shall RESPOND to the motion for summary judgment within twenty-one days of this Order. The clerk SHALL send a waiver of service of process to PRC Member Number 1. Signed by Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 10/14/2016. (tvt)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER dismissing as moot 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend ; granting 20 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 5/27/2016. (slt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoglan v. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?