Grant v. The City of Roanoke, VA

Case Number: 7:2016cv00007
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting judgment to the defendant on the plaintiff's procedural due process claim. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 3/18/19. (sas)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/7/2017. (ck)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/18/2017. (bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. The City of Roanoke, VA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?