Volvo Group North America, LLC v. Truck Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Defendant: Truck Enterprises, Inc, Truck Enterprises, Inc., Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc. and Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Kenworth Truck Company
Case Number: 7:2016cv00025
Filed: January 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2018 Filing 123 MANDATE of USCA as to #118 Notice of Appeal, filed by Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., James E Hartman (sas)
May 25, 2018 Filing 122 USCA JUDGMENT as to #118 Notice of Appeal, filed by Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., James E Hartman (Attachments: #1 Notice of Judgment)(sas)
May 25, 2018 Filing 121 USCA Memorandum Opinion from 4th Circuit re #118 Notice of Appeal, affirming decided on 5/25/2018 (sas)
May 18, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #118 Notice of Appeal, filed by Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., James E Hartman. USCA Case Number 17-1638. Case Manager: Richard H. Sewell (sas)
May 18, 2017 Filing 119 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #118 Notice of Appeal, NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (sas)
May 18, 2017 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #117 Order, by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0423-2675568. (Charapp, Michael)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 FINAL JUDGMENT - Dissolving #70 Preliminary Injunction; Releasing #73 Volvo's Surety Bond; Entering Judgment as set forth in #111 memorandum opinion and order; and Striking case from active docket of this court. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/28/17. (sas)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re: #115 Stipulation. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/28/17. (sas)
April 27, 2017 Filing 115 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kenworth Truck Company (Arnold, Edward)
April 12, 2017 Filing 114 In Chambers Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Status Conference held on 4/12/2017. No order forthcoming. (med)
April 6, 2017 Filing 113 Notice Rescheduling Hearing (N) (No Interpreter requested) previously set for April 12, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Dillon - Status Conference set for 4/12/2017 at 9:30 AM by conference call before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers sent the dial-in instructions to the parties. Call updated to adjust the time only.)(mf)
April 4, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Status Conference set for April 12, 2017 at 10:00 AM by telephone conference call before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers has sent the dial-in instructions to the parties.)(mf)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #88 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #89 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/31/17. (med)
March 29, 2017 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions Hearing held on July 28, 2016 before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sonia Ferris, Telephone number sonia.ferris@gmail.com 540.434.3181 Ext. 7. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2017. (sf) (Main Document 110 replaced on 4/21/2017)- court date left off of cover page (bkd).
March 23, 2017 Filing 109 Financial arrangements made (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) re #108 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 3/30/2017. (sf)
March 17, 2017 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Cross Motions for Summary Judgment held on 7-28-2016 reported by Court Reporter Sonia Ferris before Judge Dillon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Charapp, Michael)
July 28, 2016 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2016 re #89 MOTION for Summary JudgmentCross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., James E Hartman, #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. Court will issue ruling. (Court Reporter Sonia Ferris.) (med)
July 20, 2016 Filing 105 Sealed Document/Joseph S. Estabrook's Unredacted Affidavit (eot)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #102 Motion to Seal Unredacted Copy of Estabrook's Affidavit. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/18/2016. (eot)
July 13, 2016 Filing 103 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Jarrett, David)
July 13, 2016 Filing 102 MOTION to Seal Document #101 Reply to Response to Motion by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarrett, David)
July 13, 2016 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Joseph S. Estabrook)(Jarrett, David)
July 13, 2016 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion re #89 MOTION for Summary JudgmentCross MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Charapp, Michael)
July 11, 2016 Filing 99 Sealed Document/Attachment 2 to Jeffrey G. Barbour's Affidavit re: #96 (eot)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/1/2016. (am)
June 29, 2016 Filing 97 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION for Summary JudgmentCross MOTION for Summary Judgment , #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment /Response of Kenworth Truck Company to Motions for Summary Judgment. filed by Kenworth Truck Company. (McGrath, James)
June 29, 2016 Filing 96 MOTION to Seal Document by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Mark)
June 29, 2016 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Callahan, Mark)
June 29, 2016 Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION for Summary JudgmentCross MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Jarrett, David)
June 16, 2016 Filing 93 Notice of Correction: Changed viewing restriction of Attachments for Document No. #88 with incorrect PDF, due to attorney attaching the Memorandum in Support and Attachments; only viewable by court personnel. Document correctly filed at Document No. #92 . (eot)
June 16, 2016 Filing 92 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #88 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Scully, Elizabeth) (eot).
June 15, 2016 Filing 91 Notice of Correction: Changed viewing restriction of Attachments for Document No. #89 with incorrect PDF due to attorney attaching the Memorandum in Support and Attachments; only viewable by court personnel. Document correctly filed at Document No. #90 . (eot)
June 15, 2016 Filing 90 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #89 MOTION for Summary JudgmentCross MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hartman Affidavit, #2 Exhibit David Winner Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit Ltr. to David Jarrett and Volvo Discovery Resp.)(Charapp, Michael)
June 15, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION for Summary Judgment by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Hartman Affidavit, #3 Exhibit David Winner Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit Ltr. to David Jarrett and Volvo's Disc. Resp.)(Charapp, Michael) Modified on 6/15/2016 to reflect the correct docket event and filer was advised of the correct docket event to use for future filings. (eot).
June 14, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Scully, Elizabeth)
May 16, 2016 Filing 87 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 4-28-2016 before Judge Elizabeth Dillon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janelle Mundy, Contract Reporter, Telephone number 540/342-2547. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2016. (bkd)
May 13, 2016 Filing 86 Financial arrangements made (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) re #85 Transcript Request,, Transcript due by 6/13/2016. (bkd)
May 5, 2016 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Motions Hearing held on 4/28/2016 reported by Court Reporter Janelle Mundy, Contract Reporter before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Callahan, Mark) Modified on 5/5/2016 - edited to reflect court reporter's name (bkd).
May 4, 2016 Filing 84 ANSWER to #71 Intervenor Complaint, by Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc..(Callahan, Mark)
May 3, 2016 Filing 83 Volvo Trucks North America's ANSWER to #71 Intervenor Complaint, by Volvo Group North America, LLC.(Jarrett, David)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORAL ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for summary judgment must be filed on or before June 15, 2016; that any response in opposition to any motion for summary judgment must be filed on or before June 29, 2016; and that any reply in support of any motion for summary judgment must be filed on or before July 13, 2016. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/3/2016. (mf)
May 3, 2016 Filing 81 Notice Rescheduling Hearing (CR) (No Interpreter requested) previously set for June 27, 2016 at 1:00 pm before Judge Dillon in RoanokeHearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for July 28, 2016 at 1:00 PM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
April 28, 2016 Filing 80 In Chambers Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2016 re #76 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Court Reporter Janelle Mundy, sworn.) (med)
April 27, 2016 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION for Protective Order . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Charapp, Michael)
April 25, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #76 MOTION for Protective Order : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for April 28, 2016 at 1:00 PM by telephone conference call before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers to email dial-in instructions to the parties.)(mf)
April 21, 2016 Filing 76 MOTION for Protective Order by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Scully, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/14/2016. (bw)
April 14, 2016 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/14/2016. (bw)
April 14, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC re #70 Order on Motion for TRO Surety Bond for Injunction (Jarrett, David)
April 13, 2016 Filing 72 Transcript Copy Delivered re #62 Transcript Request,, (cj)
April 13, 2016 Filing 71 Intervenor COMPLAINT against Truck Enterprises, Inc.; Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc.; Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.; and Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., filed by Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(sas)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/13/16. (sas)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/13/16. (sas)
April 13, 2016 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/13/16. (sas)
April 11, 2016 Filing 67 Notice of Correction re #66 Stipulation, Attached Text of Proposed Protective Order and Exhibit A to docket entry for counsel. Regenerated NEF to parties to deliver copies. (sas)
April 11, 2016 Filing 66 STIPULATION for Protective Order by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc., Volvo Group North America, LLC (Callahan, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2016: #2 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order, #3 Exhibit A) (sas).
April 7, 2016 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on March 30, 2016 before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Jacobs, Telephone number carolj@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2016. (cj)
April 7, 2016 Filing 64 Financial arrangements made (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) re #62 Transcript Request,, Transcript due by 4/14/2016. (cj)
April 7, 2016 Filing 63 Financial arrangements made (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) re #59 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 4/14/2016. (cj)
April 4, 2016 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST - COPY (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Motions Hearing held on 03/30/2016 reported by Court Reporter Carol Jacobs before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Callahan, Mark) Modified on 4/4/2016 to add as a copy request(rkm). (Main Document 62 replaced on 4/4/2016 to add correct PDF document.) (rkm)
April 1, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for June 27, 2016 at 01:00 PM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORAL ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for summary judgment must be filed on or before May 18, 2016; that any response in opposition to any motion for summary judgment must be filed on or before June 1, 2016; and that any reply in support of any motion for summary judgment must be filed on or before June 10, 2016. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on April 1, 2016. (mf)
March 31, 2016 Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by Volvo Group North America, LLC for Motion Hearing held on 03/30/2016 reported by Court Reporter Carol Jacobs before Judge District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillion. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Scully, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2016 Filing 58 Sealed Document - Stock Purchase Agreement. (Sealed pursuant to #56 Sealing Order.) (Attachments: #1 First Amendment to the Stock Purchase and Redemption Agreement)(sas)
March 30, 2016 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Motion Hearing held on 3/30/2016 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC, #32 MOTION to Intervene filed by Kenworth Truck Company. Arguments of movant and plaintiff's counsel. Court will issue ruling. Defendants' motion to file unredacted agreement under seal. Court accepts the agreement under seal for purposes of today's hearing and will make determination whether to allow unredacted agreement to remain sealed. Court accepts submitted declarations for purposes of today's hearing. Arguments by counsel as to bond re: Preliminary Injunction. Court will issue ruling. Counsel to contact chambers this week to set motion for summary judgment hearing. (Court Reporter Carol Jacobs.) (med)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/30/16. (sas)
March 30, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION to File under Seal an Unredacted copy of Stock Purchase Agreement by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. (sas)
March 29, 2016 Filing 53 Response re #51 Response, in Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Reply. filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Weiss, Brad)
March 29, 2016 Filing 52 Response re #44 Notice (Other), #42 Notice (Other), #43 Notice (Other) . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Callahan, Mark)
March 28, 2016 Filing 51 Plaintiff's Supplement to Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Brief filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC re #41 Reply to Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(bw)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to File. Supplemental Brief due by 5pm on 3/29/2016. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/28/2016. (bw)
March 28, 2016 Filing 49 First MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Opposition by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A - Order and Reasons, #3 Exhibit B - Final Declaratory Judgment Including Injunctive Relief, #4 Exhibit C - Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Asset Purchase Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - Answer to Second Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit F - Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Exhibit G - Memo In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarrett, David)
March 24, 2016 Filing 48 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (sas)
March 23, 2016 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Kenworth Truck Company's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction). filed by Kenworth Truck Company. (McGrath, James)
March 23, 2016 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Support re #32 MOTION to Intervene (Reply Memorandum in Support of Kenworth Truck Company's Motion to Intervene). filed by Kenworth Truck Company. (McGrath, James)
March 23, 2016 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc..(Callahan, Mark)
March 22, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC re #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Plaintiff's Objections to the Declaration of Kyle Treadway) (Jarrett, David)
March 22, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC re #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Plaintiff's Objections to the Declaration of Lance Jorgensen) (Jarrett, David)
March 22, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC re #36 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Plaintiff's Objections to the Declaration of James Hartman) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Mediation Confidentiality Agreement))(Jarrett, David)
March 22, 2016 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Jarrett, David)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #37 MOTION for Alison K. Eggers and James C. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorneys. James C. McGrath and Alison K. Eggers for Kenworth Truck Company added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/17/16. (sas)
March 16, 2016 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Intervene . filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Jarrett, David)
March 16, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION for Alison K. Eggers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Edward)
March 16, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION for James C. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Edward)
March 15, 2016 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF). filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Weiss, Brad)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER regarding MOTION to Intervene #32 filed by Kenworth Truck Company ( Brief in opposition due by 3/16/2016, Reply brief due by 3/23/2016), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #5 filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC (Brief or evidence in support of or in opposition to due by 3/23/2016). Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/9/16. (sas)
March 9, 2016 Filing 34 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kenworth Truck Company identifying Corporate Parent PACCAR Inc. for Kenworth Truck Company. (Arnold, Edward)
March 8, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #32 MOTION to Intervene : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for March 30, 2016 at 10:00 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
March 7, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION to Intervene by Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Kenworth Truck Company's Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit A (Proposed Complaint), #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Complaint (TEI Agreement), #4 Exhibit B to Proposed Complaint (Roanoke Agreement), #5 Exhibit C to Proposed Complaint (Lynchburg Agreement), #6 Exhibit D to Proposed Complaint (Hagerstown Agreement), #7 Exhibit E to Proposed Complaint (Richmond Agreement), #8 Exhibit F to Proposed Complaint (Manassas Agreement), #9 Exhibit G to Proposed Complaint (Chesapeake Agreement), #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Edward)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for leave to submit additional briefing and evidence on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; deadline for defendants to submit any additional briefing and evidence is 3/15/16; deadline for plaintiff to submit any additional briefing and evidence in response to any additional briefing and evidence submitted by defendants is 3/22/16. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/7/16. (eot)
March 3, 2016 Filing 30 Response in Opposition to the Request for Entry of Order on Motion for Injuctive Relief and Request for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing and Additional Hearing. filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Weiss, Brad)
March 2, 2016 Filing 29 Transcript Copy Delivered re #27 Transcript Request, (bkd)
March 1, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Mediation and Request for Entry of Order on Motion for Injunctive Relief) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Notice)(Jarrett, David)
February 29, 2016 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST - COPY (14 calendar days Service) by Volvo Group North America, LLC for Motions Hearing held on 2/02/2016 reported by Court Reporter Janelle Mundy before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillion. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Scully, Elizabeth) Modified on 3/1/2016 - to reflect copy (bkd).
February 18, 2016 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on February 2, 2016 before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janelle Mundy, Contract Court Reporter, Telephone number 540/342-2547. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2016. (bkd)
February 18, 2016 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Description: Order #23 resent to Michael Charapp at 8180 Greensboro Drive, Suite 1000, McLean, VA 22102 (sas)
February 8, 2016 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (14 calendar days Service) by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Motions Hearing held on 2/02/2016 reported by Court Reporter Janelle Mundy before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Callahan, Mark) (Main Document 24 replaced on 2/8/2016 to correct PFD format.) (rkm).
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER regarding Stipulation #22 filed by Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., James E Hartman. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/5/16. (sas)
February 4, 2016 Filing 22 STIPULATION by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. (Callahan, Mark)
February 2, 2016 Filing 20 Exhibit List for hearing held on 2/2/16 by Volvo Group North America, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pltf's Exh. 6 to the complaint)(med)
February 2, 2016 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Motion Hearing held on 2/2/2016 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC.Arguments of counsel. Parties to file stipulation by 2-5-16. (Court Reporter Janelle Mundy, sworn.) (med)
February 2, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Bowman Callahan on behalf of James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. (Callahan, Mark)
February 1, 2016 Filing 17 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc.. (Callahan, Mark)
February 1, 2016 Filing 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.. (Callahan, Mark)
February 1, 2016 Filing 15 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc.. (Callahan, Mark)
February 1, 2016 Filing 14 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truck Enterprises, Inc. (Callahan, Mark)
February 1, 2016 Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1 of 2), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2 of 2))(Callahan, Mark)
January 28, 2016 Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc.; Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.; Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc.; Truck Enterprises, Inc.(sas)
January 27, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for February 2, 2016 at 9:00 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Billy M. Donley and David R. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Billy M. Donley and David R. Jarrett for Volvo Group North America, LLC added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/27/16. (sas)
January 27, 2016 Filing 9 Proposed Summons by Volvo Group North America, LLC as to Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc..(Scully, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2016 Filing 8 Proposed Summons by Volvo Group North America, LLC as to Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc..(Scully, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2016 Filing 7 Proposed Summons by Volvo Group North America, LLC as to Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc..(Scully, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2016 Filing 6 Proposed Summons by Volvo Group North America, LLC as to Truck Enterprises, Inc..(Scully, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scully, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Billy M. Donley and David R. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scully, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.(sas)
January 26, 2016 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volvo Group North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aktiebolaget Volvo. Corporate Parent OMX Nordic Exchange, Sweden for Volvo Group North America, LLC. (sas)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, Receipt #0423-2381689.), filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. 70 Day Notice due by 4/5/2016 90 Day Service due by 4/25/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volvo Group North America, LLC v. Truck Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Represented By: Billy Martin Donley
Represented By: David Ray Jarrett
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Enterprises, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Hartman
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kenworth Truck Company
Represented By: Alison K. Eggers
Represented By: James Chafel McGrath
Represented By: Edward Victor Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?