Wilson v. Swiney et al
Case Number: 7:2016cv00332
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 7/23/2019. (tvt)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice (Order and/or Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 5/22/2018. (tvt)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 11/17/2017. (slt)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Protective Order; denying 49 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 18 Motion for Protective Order; denying 21 Motion for Summary Judgment (Order mailed to Pro Se Party); granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment (Opinion & Order mailed to Pro Se Party); granting 29 Motion to Compel; defendants shall have thirty days from the entry of this order to file any motion for summary judgment. If no motion for summary judgment is filed, this matter will be set for trial as to all remaining claims. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/5/2017. (tvt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Swiney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?