Volvo Group North America, LLC v. Truck Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Volvo Group North America, LLC and Volvo Group North America, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Volvo Trucks North America
Defendant: Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc. and Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Kenworth Truck Company
Case Number: 7:2018cv00043
Filed: January 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/3/2020. (aab)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Oral ORDER LIFTING STAY. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on June 3, 2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mf)
June 2, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint as to all Defendants by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarrett, David)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/19/2020. (aab)
February 18, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Stay (Agreed) by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarrett, David)
February 5, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Status Conference set for February 12, 2020 at 2:00 PM by telephone conference call before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
February 5, 2020 Filing 62 Response re #61 Notice (Other) Request for Dismissal . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Charapp, Michael)
February 4, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC of Material Event (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jarrett, David)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order Referring Case for Mediation before the Honorable J. Michael Gamble. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 10/10/2019. (aab)
October 10, 2019 Filing 59 CONSENT to Mediation by Volvo Group North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Referral to Mediation)(Jarrett, David)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying #49 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 09/12/2019. (aab) (Main Document 58 replaced on 9/12/2019 to reflect the correct dkt. No. to the motion to dismiss, NEF Regenerated) (aab). Modified on 9/12/2019 (aab).
September 12, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 09/12/2019. (aab)
March 11, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint as Moot . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Charapp, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORAL ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply due by 3/11/2019. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on February 25, 2019. (mf)
February 25, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 Response in Opposition to Motion by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Charapp, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint as Moot . filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Jarrett, David)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORAL ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; Response to #49 Motion to Dismiss Complaint due by 2/25/2019. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/11/2019. (bwd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint as Moot by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time)(Jarrett, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 50 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #49 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint as Moot . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Charapp, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint as Moot by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Charapp, Michael)
January 24, 2019 Filing 48 In Chambers Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Status Conference held by conference call on 1/24/2019. (bwd)
December 6, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Status Conference set for January 24, 2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers will send the dial-in information to the parties.)(mf)
October 3, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE by Volvo Group North America, LLC re #45 Surety Bond for Preliminary Injunction (Jarrett, David)
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting #5 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 09/30/2018. (aab)
August 13, 2018 Filing 44 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplement to Defendants' Opposition Brief [Doc. 12]. filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Charapp, Michael)
August 10, 2018 Filing 43 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Supplemental as Required by Dkt No. 42). filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Jarrett, David)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER LIFTING STAY and Order to File Briefs (Briefs due by 8/13/2018). Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/30/18. (sas)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/9/18. (sas)
May 7, 2018 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2018 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Court Reporter J. Meyer.) (bw)
May 7, 2018 Filing 39 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (sas)
May 2, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to #34 Intervenor Complaint, by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc..(Charapp, Michael)
April 25, 2018 Filing 37 Supplement to #12 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition, filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(sas)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORAL ORDER granting #35 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk is directed to file Exhibit 1 to Dkt. No. 35 as a separate docket entry. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on April 23, 2018. (mf)
April 20, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Defendants' Opposition Brief [Doc. 12] by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Charapp, Michael)
April 12, 2018 Filing 34 Intervenor COMPLAINT against Truck Enterprises, Inc.; James E. Hartman; Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc.; Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.; and Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., filed by Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Arnold, Edward)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. Kenworth shall file its complaint in intervention not later than seven days after entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 4/11/18. (sas)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 MOTION for James C. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/16/18. (sas)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 MOTION for Alison K. Eggers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/16/18. (sas)
March 15, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Alison Eggers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Edward)
March 15, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for James C. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Edward)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER staying all statutory and contractual time periods and staying all discovery until Court enters an order on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/5/18. (sas)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/5/18. (sas)
February 28, 2018 Filing 26 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Intervene (Unopposed) . filed by Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Edward)
February 28, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for May 7, 2018 at 2:00 PM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf) Modified on 3/12/2018, to correct time from AM to PM (bw).
February 27, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #11 Order, #10 Stipulation by Kenworth Truck Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Edward)
February 27, 2018 Filing 23 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kenworth Truck Company identifying Corporate Parent PACCAR Inc. for Kenworth Truck Company. (Arnold, Edward)
February 27, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Intervene (Unopposed) by Kenworth Truck Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Proposed Complaint), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Edward)
February 27, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jarrett, David)
February 26, 2018 Filing 20 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (sas)
February 26, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc..(Charapp, Michael)
February 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Darin Weiss on behalf of James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. (Weiss, Brad)
February 21, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Bowman Callahan on behalf of All Defendants (Callahan, Mark)
February 20, 2018 Filing 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc.. (Charapp, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Filing 15 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc.. (Charapp, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Filing 14 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Truck Enterprises, Inc. for Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.. (Charapp, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Filing 13 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truck Enterprises, Inc. (Charapp, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Filing 12 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #7 Brief / Memorandum in Support . filed by James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Charapp, Michael)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding Stipulation #10 filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/12/2018. (ck)
February 2, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Volvo Group North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarrett, David)
January 31, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Correction: Changed viewingrestriction of Attachment 1, to #5 Motion; only viewable by court personnel.Document correctly filed at Document #7 Brief/Memorandum in Support by counsel. (sas)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Billy M. Donley and David R. Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Billy Martin Donley and David Ray Jarrett for Volvo Group North America, LLC added. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 1/31/18. (sas)
January 30, 2018 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Scully, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for David R. Jarrett and Billy M. Donley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Scully, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scully, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Volvo Group North America, LLC. Amendment to #2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement (Scully, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 summons - James E. Hartman, #2 summons - Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., #3 Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., #4 summons - Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc.)(sas)
January 30, 2018 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volvo Group North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aktiebolaget Volvo, OMX Nordic Exchange, Sweden for Volvo Group North America, LLC. (sas)
January 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James E Hartman, Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc., Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc., Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc., Truck Enterprises, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.,receipt #0423-2828005), filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, Part 1, #6 Exhibit 5, Part 2, #7 Exhibit 5, Part 3, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, Part 1, #15 Exhibit 12, Part 2, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volvo Group North America, LLC v. Truck Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Scully
Represented By: Billy Martin Donley
Represented By: David Ray Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volvo Group North America, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Volvo Trucks North America
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Scully
Represented By: Billy Martin Donley
Represented By: David Ray Jarrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Enterprises Hagerstown, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E Hartman
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Enterprises Roanoke, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Enterprises Lynchburg, Inc.
Represented By: Brad Darin Weiss
Represented By: Michael G. Charapp
Represented By: Mark Bowman Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Kenworth Truck Company
Represented By: Alison K. Eggers
Represented By: James Chafel McGrath
Represented By: Edward Victor Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?