The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC v. John Doe Corporation 1 et al

Plaintiff: The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 2, John Doe Corporation 3, John Doe Corporation 4 and John Doe Corporation 1
Case Number: 7:2018cv00516
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC. (Fitzsimmons, Scott)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER resetting Status Report deadline for discovery update to 1/18/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/10/2018. (ssm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzsimmons, Scott)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding Status Report, filed at #6 -Status Report due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/16/2018. (aab)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit CO Ltr re Bonds, #3 Exhibit BAE Radford BOA, #4 Exhibit K-Con v. U.S.)(Fitzsimmons, Scott)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Discovery; granting #4 Motion to Stay Case, and setting deadline for status report 11/15/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/05/2018. (ssm)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery , MOTION to Stay Rule 4 Proceedings by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay and for Discovery, #3 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Michael E. Sipple, #4 Exhibit 2 - BAE BOA, #5 Exhibit 3 - 10-9-18 BAE re no Bond, #6 Exhibit 4 - E-mail Response from CO, #7 Exhibit 5 - E-mail to CO Request Bond w Ltr, #8 Exhibit 6 - E-mail to CO with History)(Fitzsimmons, Scott)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC as to John Doe Corporation 1, John Doe Corporation 2, John Doe Corporation 3, John Doe Corporation 4.(sas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent Fluor Corporation for The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC. (sas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe Corporation 1, John Doe Corporation 2, John Doe Corporation 3, John Doe Corporation 4 (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400., receipt #0423-3000676.), filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC v. John Doe Corporation 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the use and benefit of Fluor Federal Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Scott Patrick Fitzsimmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?