The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Dudley
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Lewis A Dudley
Case Number: 7:2018cv00554
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Lewis A Dudley served on 12/5/2018, answer due 12/26/2018.(aab)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lewis A Dudley NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(aab)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company (aab)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lewis A Dudley (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, receipt# 0423-3014256), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis A Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: David Brooks Hundley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?