Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC v. 4.72 Acres of Land, Owned by Fred W. Vest

Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: 4.72 Acres of Land, Owned by Fred W. Vest
Case Number: 7:2018cv00647
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 2/5/2019. (ck)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Pretrial Conference set for August 16, 2019 at 1:00 PM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/26-27/2019 09:30 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 12/31/2018. (ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC v. 4.72 Acres of Land, Owned by Fred W. Vest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Represented By: Mark E. Frye
Represented By: Seth Michael Land
Represented By: Stephen M. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.72 Acres of Land, Owned by Fred W. Vest
Represented By: William B. Hopkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?