Bradley et al v. Cunningham et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Dawn Bradley Lane and Randolph Scott Bradley
Defendant: Otis Terry Cunningham and Fortress Wood Products, Inc.
Respondent: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00025
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with attached complaint served on Otis Terry Cunningham and Fortress Wood Products, Inc. on 2/19/2019, filed by Otis Terry Cunningham, Fortress Wood Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service-Fortress Wood Products, Inc.)(ck)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Brydges, Brian)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Filing Requirement to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (sas)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service of Summons and Complaint on January 23, 2019 upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company c/o Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent(Johnson, Neal)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint #1 with JURY DEMAND by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Brydges, Brian)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (sas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fortress Wood Products, Inc. Wholly owned subsidiary of The Lester Group, Inc. (Persian, Eric) Modified on 1/30/2019 to add corporate parent (sas).
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by Otis Terry Cunningham, Fortress Wood Products, Inc..(Persian, Eric)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Otis Terry Cunningham, Fortress Wood Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 summons - Fortress Wood Products, Inc., #2 summons - State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company)(sas)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Otis Terry Cunningham, Fortress Wood Products, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400., receipt #7-59064), filed by Randolph Scott Bradley, Kimberly Dawn Bradley Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley et al v. Cunningham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Terry Cunningham
Represented By: Eric M. Persian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortress Wood Products, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Persian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Dawn Bradley Lane
Represented By: William Andersen Jennings
Represented By: Neal Stanley Johnson
Represented By: Peter Brent Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Scott Bradley
Represented By: William Andersen Jennings
Represented By: Neal Stanley Johnson
Represented By: Peter Brent Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian James Brydges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?