Sowers v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: James E. Sowers
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00142
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Entry of Dismissal with prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (ck)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Dickinson, Ian)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Dickinson, Ian)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 State Court Records received from the Circuit Court of the City of Roanoke, CL18-2573 (aab)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 3/7/2019. Entered by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 2/11/2019. (bwd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Dickinson, Ian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Requirement - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Roanoke City Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 02/08/2019. (aab)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickinson, Ian)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Roanoke City Circuit Court, case number CL18-2573. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt# 0423-3068570), filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Records, #3 Exhibit B)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sowers v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Sowers
Represented By: Michael A. Cleary
Represented By: Charles Robison Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian Ramsey-Baird Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?