Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC v. 0.19 Acres of Land, Owned By Cletus Woodrow Bohon and Beverly Ann Bohon et al
Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: 2.74 Acres of Land, Owned By Cletus Woodrow Bohon and Beverly Ann Bohon and 0.19 Acres of Land, Owned By Cletus Woodrow Bohon and Beverly Ann Bohon
Case Number: 7:2019cv00146
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER denying #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court received a letter from Mr. and Mrs. Bohon requesting an extension of time to respond to written discovery in this case. When a case is not in a mediation setting, the court will not correspond directly with a party who is represented by counsel but will only correspond with the attorneys in the case. See Haefner v. County of Lancaster, Pa., 165 F.R.D. 58, 59 (E.D. Va. 1996)("[A] party represented by counsel has no right to conduct part of his own case by filing pleadings, conducting depositions, arguing motions, or examining witnesses during trial."). The Bohons are represented by counsel in this matter; thus, the Court will not consider the letter and the relief requested. Accordingly, the extension of time requested by the Bohons is denied as improperly filed. Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 3/11/19. (lg)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time for interrogatories by 0.19 Acres of Land, Owned By Cletus Woodrow Bohon and Beverly Ann Bohon, 2.74 Acres of Land, Owned By Cletus Woodrow Bohon and Beverly Ann Bohon. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (sas)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 3:00 PM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mf)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/22 - 24/2020 09:30 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 2/8/19. (sas) Modified on 2/11/2019 to reflect Jury Trial 2020 (sas). Modified on 2/11/2019 (sas). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/5/2019) (sas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC v. 0.19 Acres of Land, Owned By Cletus Woodrow Bohon and Beverly Ann Bohon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.74 Acres of Land, Owned By Cletus Woodrow Bohon and Beverly Ann Bohon
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Lollar, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.19 Acres of Land, Owned By Cletus Woodrow Bohon and Beverly Ann Bohon
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Lollar, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Represented By: Seth Michael Land
Represented By: Mark E. Frye
Represented By: Stephen M. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?