Snow v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Heath Snow
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 7:2019cv00162
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ams)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Mail Return Receipt by Heath Snow. All Defendants.(Hancock, Gary)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued US Attorney, #2 Summons Issued Attorney General)(ams)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 02/13/2019. (ams)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill, filed by Heath Snow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Heath Snow. (ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snow v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Snow
Represented By: Gary Clay Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?