Brooks v. Bennett et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Ray Brooks
Defendant: Harold W. Clark and Adrianne L. Bennett
Case Number: 7:2019cv00169
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with an Amended Complaint Responses due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 3/15/2019. (tvt)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Curtis Ray Brooks (ck)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983 regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/15/2019. (tvt)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Curtis Ray Brooks (ck)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 Statement of Assets by Curtis Ray Brooks (ck)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Verified Statement by Plaintiff Curtis Ray Brooks (ck)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Curtis Ray Brooks.Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support)(ck)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Adrianne L. Bennett, Harold W. Clark, filed by Curtis Ray Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibits)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Bennett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold W. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrianne L. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Ray Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?