Bradley v. The Commonwealth of Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Terry C. Bradley
Defendant: Virginia Tech College, The Commonwealth of Virginia, Any and all unknown defendants and Virginia Tech Police Department
Case Number: 7:2019cv00253
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Any and all unknown defendants, The Commonwealth of Virginia, Virginia Tech College, Virginia Tech Police Department, filed by Terry C. Bradley. (Attachments: #1 attachment to complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(ams) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2019: #4 Subpoena) (ams).
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00045. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #2 Memorandum and Recommendations. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/21/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Terry C. Bradley at 3724 Sapphire Rd., Unit 2, Fayetteville, NC 28303. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #2 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS and #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE regarding #2 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terry C. Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terry C. Bradley. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 3/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 2/22/2019. Copy sent to Terry C. Bradley via US Mail to 3724 Sapphire Rd., Unit 2, Fayetteville, NC 28303. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
February 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
February 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Terry C. Bradley. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/22/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Terry C. Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Attachment to complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge, #5 Proposed Subpoena, #6 Envelope) (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 3/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. The Commonwealth of Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Tech College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and all unknown defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Tech Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry C. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?