Dawson v. Kroger Limited Partnership I

Plaintiff: Donna L. Dawson
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Case Number: 7:2019cv00388
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kroger Limited Partnership I. Kroger Limited Partnership I waiver sent on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019.(Hastings, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kroger Limited Partership I, c/o Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent on 6/12/2019 by Donna L. Dawson. Waiver of Service due by 7/12/2019.(Grimes, Terry)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kroger Limited Partnership I (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt #0423-3149052), filed by Donna L. Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L. Dawson
Represented By: Terry Neill Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?