Fourstar Group USA, Inc. v. K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Fourstar Group USA, Inc.
Defendant: K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00440
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc. answer due 8/30/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/7/2019. (ck)
August 6, 2019 Filing 16 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickenson, Charles)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc. answer due 8/7/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/24/2019. (ck)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickenson, Charles)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc. answer due 7/24/2019.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 07/10/2019. (aab)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleadings by K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickenson, Charles)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Jesse Dickenson on behalf of K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc. (Dickenson, Charles)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis H. Casola on behalf of All Defendants (Casola, Francis)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kathleen M. Wade for Fourstar Group USA, Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 6/18/2019. (ck)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Kathleen M. Wade to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3165464. by Fourstar Group USA, Inc.. (Hopkins, William)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Richard E. Fee for Fourstar Group USA, Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 6/17/2019. (ck) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/18/2019 with correct pdf) (ck). Modified on 6/18/2019 (ck).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Richard E. Fee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3162877. by Fourstar Group USA, Inc.. (Hopkins, William)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright by the Clerk (ck)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ck)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fourstar Group USA, Inc. (ck)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt #0423-316316), filed by Fourstar Group USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fourstar Group USA, Inc. v. K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fourstar Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: William B. Hopkins, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Edson Fee
Represented By: Kathleen Mary Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Francis H. Casola
Represented By: Charles Jesse Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?