Commonwealth of Virginia v. Skyline Metrics, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Defendant: Skyline Metrics, LLC, Bryant Cass and Adventis, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00463
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adventis, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Adventis Acquisition, Inc. for Adventis, Inc.. (Rottenborn, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Skyline Metrics, LLC (Rottenborn, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bryant Cass (Rottenborn, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Adventis, Inc., Bryant Cass, Skyline Metrics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottenborn, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Benjamin Rottenborn on behalf of All Defendants (Rottenborn, John)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commonwealth of Virginia. Adventis, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Bryant Cass waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019; Skyline Metrics, LLC waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019.(Ward, Geoffrey)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adventis, Inc., Bryant Cass, Skyline Metrics, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, receipt# 0423-3169744 ), filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commonwealth of Virginia v. Skyline Metrics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Metrics, LLC
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Cass
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventis, Inc.
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Geoffrey Laurence Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?