Penn National Security Insurance Company et al v. Eakin et al
Plaintiff: Penn National Security Insurance Company and Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Super Vac Truck & More, Inc., Dakota Deemer, D.E. Eakin, Inc., D.E. Eakin & Sons, Inc., Brian Keith Moore, Sarah Deemer and Donald B. Eakin
Case Number: 7:2019cv00475
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Donald B. Eakin answer due 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/15/2019. (aab)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Donald B. Eakin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowman, Gary)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service of Super Vac Truck & More, Inc. on 7/26/2019 upon Donald Eakin, RA(Peritz, Marc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service of D.E. Eakin & Sons, Inc. on 7/26/2019 upon Donald B. Eakin, President(Peritz, Marc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service of D.E. Eakin, Inc. on 7/26/2019 upon Donald B. Eakin, RA(Peritz, Marc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service of Donald B. Eakin on 7/26/2019 upon Donald B. Eakin(Peritz, Marc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brian Keith Moore, D.E. Eakin & Sons, Inc., D.E. Eakin, Inc., Dakota Deemer, Sarah Deemer, Donald B. Eakin, Super Vac Truck & More, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to D. E. Eakin & Sons, Inc., #2 Electronic Summons Issued as to D.E. Eakin, Inc., #3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Dakota Deemer, #4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Donald Eakin, #5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sarah Deemer, #6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Super Vac Truck & More, Inc.)(aab)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons by Penn National Security Insurance Company, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company as to Super Vac Truck & More, Inc..(Peritz, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons by Penn National Security Insurance Company, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company as to Sarah Deemer.(Peritz, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons by Penn National Security Insurance Company, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company as to Donald B. Eakin.(Peritz, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons by Penn National Security Insurance Company, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company as to D.E. Eakin, Inc..(Peritz, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons by Penn National Security Insurance Company, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company as to D.E. Eakin & Sons, Inc..(Peritz, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons by Penn National Security Insurance Company, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company as to Dakota Deemer.(Peritz, Marc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Penn National Security Insurance Company, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company as to Brian Keith Moore.(Peritz, Marc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Peritz, Marc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penn National Security Insurance Company (Peritz, Marc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D.E. Eakin & Sons, Inc., D.E. Eakin, Inc., Dakota Deemer, Sarah Deemer, Donald B. Eakin, Brian Keith Moore, Super Vac Truck & More, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400., receipt# 0423-3173424), filed by Penn National Security Insurance Company, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn National Security Insurance Company et al v. Eakin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Vac Truck & More, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Deemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.E. Eakin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.E. Eakin & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Keith Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Deemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald B. Eakin
Represented By: Gary Michael Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn National Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc A. Peritz
Represented By: Rachel Danielle G. Horvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc A. Peritz
Represented By: Rachel Danielle G. Horvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?