Hall v. Beam et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Ray Hall
Defendant: Miller and Beam
Case Number: 7:2019cv00504
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Voluntary Dismiss and the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the case is hereby STRICKEN from the active docket of the court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/31/2019. (slt)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss by Jerry Ray Hall. (tvt)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;, Signed Complaint Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal Responses due by 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/17/2019. (slt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Statement of Assets by Jerry Ray Hall (aab)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Verified Statement by Plaintiff Jerry Ray Hall (Attachments: #1 Grievances)(aab)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Beam, Miller, filed by Jerry Ray Hall. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Beam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Ray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?