Pagans v. Saul
Plaintiff: Michael L. Pagans
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 7:2019cv00505
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael L. Pagans. Michael L. Pagans served on 7/23/2019, answer due 11/20/2019.(Geddes, Amy)
July 17, 2019 SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (aab)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons issued as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Electronic Summons issued as to Attorney General)(aab)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If needed, forms may also be found at #www.vawd.uscourts.gov/forms.aspx. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 07/17/2019. (aab)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Michael L. Pagans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael L. Pagans. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pagans v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Pagans
Represented By: Amy Hansen Geddes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?