Trail v. Department of Corrections for the Commonwealth of Virginia et al
Petitioner: Robert A. Trail
Respondent: Palmer, Virginia DOC Operations Support & Logistics, Cassandra H. Mckoy, Wendy Brown, Bernard Booker, Stephanie C. Macdonald, Darrell T. Estes, Virginia Parole Board, Department of Corrections for the Commonwealth of Virginia and Roger Honeycutt
Case Number: 7:2019cv00514
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Oral ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Petitioner shall respond to the motion to dismiss not later than September 30, 2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 9/16/19. (JCH)
September 13, 2019 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Court of Appeals of Virginia, 1718-13-2 (Records available for viewing in the clerks office.) (aab)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Motion to Dismiss by Robert A. Trail. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Ayres, Caroline)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Rule 5 Answer . filed by Department of Corrections for the Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Supplement State Court Records Requests)(Anderson, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 5 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Department of Corrections for the Commonwealth of Virginia.(Anderson, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Rule 5 Answer by Department of Corrections for the Commonwealth of Virginia. (Anderson, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Anderson, III on behalf of Department of Corrections for the Commonwealth of Virginia (Anderson, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt as to #2 Order of Prisoner Service (2254) filed by Department of Corrections for the Commonwealth of Virginia.(Anderson, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order of Service pursuant to Section 28 U.S.C. 2254 upon respondents re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert A. Trail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/1/2019. (slt)
July 19, 2019 PAID-Filing Fee Received $ 5.00, receipt number 300003493 (slt)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Robert A. Trail. ($5.00 filing paid / filed by Caroline Ayes, Esq.)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trail v. Department of Corrections for the Commonwealth of Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Virginia DOC Operations Support & Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cassandra H. Mckoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wendy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bernard Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephanie C. Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darrell T. Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Virginia Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Corrections for the Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Robert H. Anderson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roger Honeycutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert A. Trail
Represented By: Caroline Patricia Ayres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?