Brown v. JRN, Inc. of Tennessee
Plaintiff: Bernard J. Brown, Jr.
Defendant: JRN, Inc. of Tennessee
Case Number: 7:2019cv00524
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by JRN, Inc. of Tennessee (Tower, King) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/19/2019 to be flattened) (aab). Modified on 9/19/2019 (aab).
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
September 10, 2019 Notice of Filing Requirement to JRN, Inc. of Tennessee - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against Bernard J. Brown, Jr by JRN, Inc. of Tennessee.(Tower, King)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 08/14/2019. (aab)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
August 12, 2019 Notice of Filing Requirement to JRN, Inc. of Tennessee - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by JRN, Inc. of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stiegler, Leah)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Michele Stiegler on behalf of JRN, Inc. of Tennessee (Stiegler, Leah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jrn, Inc. of Tennessee NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(aab)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jrn, Inc. of Tennessee (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, receipt# 0423-3190235), filed by Bernard J. Brown, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. JRN, Inc. of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRN, Inc. of Tennessee
Represented By: King Fitchett Tower
Represented By: Leah Michele Stiegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard J. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Earl Collins
Represented By: Paul Graham Beers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?