Huffman v. Aguilar
Plaintiff: Donald W. Huffman
Defendant: Kristy Diane Aguilar
Case Number: 7:2019cv00547
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on USAA Casualty Insurance Company on 8/12/2019, filed by Donald W. Huffman.(Grimes, Terry)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served on Kristy Diane Aguilar on 8/12/19, filed by Donald W. Huffman.(Grimes, Terry)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kristy Diane Aguilar NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(sas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Donald W. Huffman as to Kristy Diane Aguilar.(Grimes, Terry)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristy Diane Aguilar (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3199177.), filed by Donald W. Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffman v. Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald W. Huffman
Represented By: Terry Neill Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Diane Aguilar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?