Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC v. Tree-Sitter 1 et al
Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Emma Howell, Phillip Flagg, Jordan Romeo, Tree-Sitter 2, Evin Tyler Ugur, John Does 1-10 and Tree-Sitter 1
Case Number: 7:2019cv00565
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand; dismissing as moot #7 Motion to Expedite; dismissing #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/23/2019. (bwd)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 Response re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading . filed by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Massie, Wade)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand [in Support of Its Request for Attorney's Fees and Sanctions]. filed by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email)(Massie, Wade)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Phillip Flagg, Emma Howell, Jordan Romeo, Evin Tyler Ugur. (Frank, Terry)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand and Request for Fees. filed by Phillip Flagg, Emma Howell, Jordan Romeo, Evin Tyler Ugur. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Terry C. Frank)(Frank, Terry)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Paper State Court Records received from Montgomery County Circuit Court, CL19-1428, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (aab)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC re #6 of Filing (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support Declaration of Wade W. Massie)(Massie, Wade)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Status Conference held on 8/19/2019. (Court Reporter: J. Webb) (bwd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Status Conference Call set for August 19, 2019 at 1:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (Chambers sent the dial-in information to the parties.)(mf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of Its Motion to Remand by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Massie, Wade)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Tobin M. Nelson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Melissa A. Plotsky)(Massie, Wade)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent WGL Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent EQM Midstream Partners, LP, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Consolidation Edison, Inc., Corporate Parent RGC Resources, Inc., Corporate Parent Equitrans Midstream Corporation for Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Massie, Wade)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/16/2019. (aab)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Montgomery County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/15/2019. (aab)
August 15, 2019 Notice of Filing Requirement to Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Montgomery County, case number CL19-1428. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, receipt# 0423-3205627 ), filed by Phillip Flagg, Jordan Romeo, Evin Tyler Ugur, Emma Howell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Records, #3 Exhibit B)(aab) Modified on 8/15/2019 to correct file date as 08/14/2019 (aab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC v. Tree-Sitter 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma Howell
Represented By: Sandra Christine Freeman
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tammy Lynn Belinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Flagg
Represented By: Sandra Christine Freeman
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tammy Lynn Belinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Romeo
Represented By: Sandra Christine Freeman
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tammy Lynn Belinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree-Sitter 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evin Tyler Ugur
Represented By: Sandra Christine Freeman
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tammy Lynn Belinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree-Sitter 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Wade W. Massie
Represented By: Seth Michael Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?