Brown v. Clarke
Petitioner: Michael Andre Brown
Respondent: Harold W. Clarke
Case Number: 7:2019cv00566
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER denying #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Replybecause the current deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss is 10/18/19, the date sought by the extension motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 09/30/19. (PMS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Paper State Court Records received from Supreme Court of Virginia, record Nos. 160926 & 180022, consisting of 1 stapled volume, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (sas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Andre Brown. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Cover Letter)(slt)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 Roseboro Notice re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Deadline set for 10/18/2019. (slt)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 Paper State Court Records received from Rockingham County Circuit Court, CL14-01918, CR14-01919 and CL19-2419, consisting of 1 Red Folder, 10 Transcripts and 1 binded volume, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (ck)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Court of Appeals of Virginia, 1762-15-3 (Records available for viewing in the clerks office.) (sas)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Harold W. Clarke re #7 , #6 , #5 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Pertinent State Court Records Form, #2 Supplement CCT Records Request Letter, #3 Supplement CAV Records Request Letter, #4 Supplement SCV Records Request Letter)(Darron, Leah)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Harold W. Clarke. (Darron, Leah)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 5 Answer RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Harold W. Clarke.(Darron, Leah)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Harold W. Clarke. (Darron, Leah)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Ann Darron on behalf of Harold W. Clarke (Darron, Leah)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt as to #2 Order of Prisoner Service (2254) filed by Harold W. Clarke.(Darron, Leah)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order of Service pursuant to Section 28 U.S.C. 2254 upon respondents re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Andre Brown. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/16/2019. (slt)
August 15, 2019 Filing Fee Received $ 5.00, receipt number 700061205 (sas)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Michael Andre Brown.( (1) Cover Letter) (slt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harold W. Clarke
Represented By: Leah Ann Darron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Andre Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?