McGlothlin v. Wellpath LLC et al
Plaintiff: Terry McGlothlin
Defendant: Cassandra Strickland, RN, Heather Taylor, RN, Jane Doe Medical Staff, Wellpath LLC and Robert Hoffert, PA
Case Number: 7:2019cv00594
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cassandra Strickland, RN on 10/29/2019, filed by Terry McGlothlin.(Lucchetti, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wellpath LLC (Axselle, Angela)
October 29, 2019 Notice of Filing Requirement to Wellpath LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Robert Hoffert, PA answer due 11/8/2019; Wellpath LLC answer due 11/8/2019.. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/25/2019. (bwd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion for Extension of Time to File Late Pleading by Robert Hoffert, PA, Wellpath LLC. (Axselle, Angela)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Boice Axselle on behalf of Robert Hoffert, PA, Wellpath LLC (Axselle, Angela)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Mark McCray on behalf of Robert Hoffert, PA, Wellpath LLC (McCray, Joel)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/22/2019. (aab)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Cassandra Strickland, RN on 10/04/2019, filed by Terry McGlothlin.(Lucchetti, Andrew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Robert Hoffert, PA on 10/03/2019, filed by Terry McGlothlin.(Lucchetti, Andrew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 Motion for issuance of subpoenas by Plaintiff Terry McGlothlin . filed by Terry McGlothlin. (Lucchetti, Andrew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for issuance of subpoenas by Plaintiff Terry McGlothlin by Terry McGlothlin. (Lucchetti, Andrew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wellpath, LLC on 10/02/2019, filed by Terry McGlothlin.(Lucchetti, Andrew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wellpath LLC Robert Hoffert, PA, Jane Doe Medical Staff, Cassandra Strickland, RN, Heather Taylor, RN, NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert Hoffert, PA, #2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Heather Taylor, RN, #3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cassandra Strickland, RN, #4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jane Doe Medical Staff)(aab)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Hoffert, PA, Jane Doe Medical Staff, Cassandra Strickland, RN, Heather Taylor, RN, Wellpath LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, receipt# 0423-3217580), filed by Terry McGlothlin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlothlin v. Wellpath LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Strickland, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Taylor, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath LLC
Represented By: Angela Boice Axselle
Represented By: Joel Mark McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hoffert, PA
Represented By: Angela Boice Axselle
Represented By: Joel Mark McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry McGlothlin
Represented By: Andrew Lucchetti
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?