Keith v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Keith
Defendant: Averitt Express, Inc. and Jamerian Dijon Moon Hall
Case Number: 7:2019cv00597
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Averitt Express, Inc. on 09/13/2019, filed by Samantha Keith.(Zebrak, Kaitlin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint #1 with JURY DEMAND by Averitt Express, Inc. and Jamerian Dijon Moon Hall.(Moyers, Jason) Modified on 9/19/2019 to indicate Jamerian Dijon Moon Hall as a filer (sas).
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Averitt Express, Inc. (Moyers, Jason)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samantha Keith. (ams)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jamerian Dijon Moon Hall NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Averitt Express, Inc.)(ams)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Averitt Express, Inc., Jamerian Dijon Moon Hall (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3218765), filed by Samantha Keith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Keith
Represented By: Kaitlin Marie Zebrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Averitt Express, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Guy Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamerian Dijon Moon Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?