Shipley v. (NLN) et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Shipley
Defendant: William Kirk, RREMC Restaurants, LLC and Dawn (NLN)
Case Number: 7:2019cv00603
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE on consent of all parties. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/29/2019. (ssm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Dawn (NLN), William Kirk, RREMC Restaurants, LLC, Sharon Shipley. (ck)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Shipley. Dawn (NLN) served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(aab)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Shipley. William Kirk served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019.(aab)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Shipley. RREMC Restaurants, LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by RREMC Restaurants, LLC (Walker, James)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
October 16, 2019 Notice of Filing Requirement to RREMC Restaurants, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint #1 with JURY DEMAND by Dawn (NLN), William Kirk, RREMC Restaurants, LLC.(Walker, James)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dawn (NLN), William Kirk, RREMC Restaurants, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400., receipt# 700061367), filed by Sharon Shipley. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shipley v. (NLN) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kirk
Represented By: James W. Walker
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RREMC Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: James W. Walker
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn (NLN)
Represented By: James W. Walker
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Rockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?