Welch v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tony Perez Welch
Defendant: Sam's Real Estate Business Trust and Sam's East, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00668
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Quash by Tony Perez Welch. (Dooley, Timothy)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/23-24/2020 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (mka) Modified on 11/27/2019 to add Order Referring to Magistrate Robert S. Ballou (mka).
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2019. (mka)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ck)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019 01:30 PM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Dial in instructions emailed to counsel.(mka) Modified on 10/21/2019 to correct time of day(mka).
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tony Perez Welch (Dooley, Timothy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's Real Estate Business Trust.(Skaff, Victor)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Scheduling Letter (mka)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #5 State Court Record at page# 9 by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. (ck)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Roanoke City Circuit Court, CL18002394-00 (ck)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Roanoke City Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/3/2019. (ck)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's Real Estate Business Trust identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart, Inc. for Sam's Real Estate Business Trust. (ck)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's East, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart, Inc. for Sam's East, Inc.. (ck)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cirucuit Court City of Roanoke, case number CL18-2394. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt #0423-3240343), filed by Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: C. Kailani Memmer
Represented By: Victor S. Skaff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: C. Kailani Memmer
Represented By: Victor S. Skaff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Perez Welch
Represented By: Timothy David Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?