Abdul-Sabur v. Well Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Wakeel Abdul-Sabur
Defendant: Well Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00674
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Wakeel Abdul-Sabur (slt)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Wakeel Abdul-Sabur. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(aab)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with a signed consent to withholding of filing fees form in order to complete the application to proceed in forma pauperis within 20 days Responses due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 11/18/2019. (tvt)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Account Report and statement of Assets by Wakeel Abdul-Sabur (tvt)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 11/1/2019. (tvt)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Wakeel Abdul-Sabur. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (ck)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. BallouMotions referred to Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/22/2019. (aab)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Well Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Wakeel Abdul-Sabur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter)(aab)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wakeel Abdul-Sabur. (aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdul-Sabur v. Well Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Well Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wakeel Abdul-Sabur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?