Goggins v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Jamar Goggins
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Norfolk Southern Corporation
Case Number: 7:2019cv00783
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corporation (Chakravorty, Agnis)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Chakravorty, Agnis)
January 8, 2020 Notice of Filing Requirement to Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORAL ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Responses are now due on or before February 20, 2020. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on January 7, 2020. (mf)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Chakravorty, Agnis)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bryan Jamar Goggins. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/20/2020.(Haddox, Brittany)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bryan Jamar Goggins. Norfolk Southern Corporation waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/20/2020.(Haddox, Brittany)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Norfolk Southern Railway Company on November 21, 2019 by Bryan Jamar Goggins. Waiver of Service due by 12/23/2019.(Haddox, Brittany)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Norfolk Southern Corporation on November 21, 2019 by Bryan Jamar Goggins. Waiver of Service due by 12/23/2019.(Haddox, Brittany)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400., receipt# 0423-3275175), filed by Bryan Jamar Goggins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goggins v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Agnis Chandra Chakravorty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Agnis Chandra Chakravorty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Jamar Goggins
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Haddox
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?