Herrmann et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Pamela Shelton Herrmann and John M. Herrmann
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00827
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:2605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent WFC Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Manning, Jason)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 1/9/2020, answer due 3/9/2020.(Manning, Jason)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Emmanuel Manning on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Manning, Jason)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Pamela Shelton Herrmann, John M. Herrmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C)(O'Keeffe, James)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ams)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3286878.), filed by Pamela Shelton Herrmann, John M. Herrmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrmann et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Shelton Herrmann
Represented By: Thomas Dean Domonoske
Represented By: James Joseph O'Keeffe, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Herrmann
Represented By: Thomas Dean Domonoske
Represented By: James Joseph O'Keeffe, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jason Emmanuel Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?