Koontz v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Lawrence L. Koontz, Jr.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00015
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/14/2020. (ck)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Dickinson, Ian)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 2/12/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 01/29/2020. (aab)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickinson, Ian)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 Paper State Court Records received from City of Salem Circuit Court, CL19-486, consisting of 1 Volume, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (aab)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 1/29/2020.Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 01/13/2020. (aab)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from City of Salem Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 01/13/2020. (aab)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dickinson, Ian)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dickinson, Ian)
January 8, 2020 Notice of Filing Requirement to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (aab)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Salem City Circuit Court, case number CL19-486. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt# 0423-3303761 ), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Records, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koontz v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Ian Ramsey-Baird Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence L. Koontz, Jr.
Represented By: Mia Yugo
Represented By: William Raymond Rakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?