Thomas v. H & W Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Thomas
Defendant: Charles Hoard, H & W Holdings, LLC and Best Logistics Group, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00257
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 Paper State Court Records received from Roanoke City Circuit Court, CL19-1049, consisting of Affidavit of Service - Charles David Hoard, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (sas)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #8 State Court Record at page # 11 by Best Logistics Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC. (sas)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Roanoke City Circuit Court, CL19001049-00 (sas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (sas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 Charles Hoard's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles Hoard.(Beck, Donald)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Roanoke City Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 04/30/2020. (ssm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Best Logistics Group, Inc. (Beck, Donald)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by H & W Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Best Logistics Group, Inc. for H & W Holdings, LLC. (Beck, Donald)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to Best Logistics Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (sas)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Roanoke City Circuit Court, case number CL19001049-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt 0423-3383715), filed by Best Logistics Group, Inc., H & W Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Service, #3 Exhibit C Answer to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D Jury Demand, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. H & W Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hoard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & W Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Logistics Group, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Thomas
Represented By: Joseph Cammarata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?