Houchens v. Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest et al
Plaintiff: Michael Wayne Houchens
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Consuella Caudill and Michael Sinclair
Case Number: 7:2020cv00266
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Entry of Dismissal without prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (sas)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Wayne Houchens (Houchens, Aaron)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Exhibits and other filings served on Rene Nordquist on May 8, 2020, filed by Michael Wayne Houchens.(Houchens, Aaron)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Wayne Houchens (Houchens, Aaron)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Consuella Caudill, Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Michael Sinclair NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 summons - Michael Sinclair, #2 summons - Consuella Caudill)(sas)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Consuella Caudill, Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Michael Sinclair (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400., receipt #0423-3388151), filed by Michael Wayne Houchens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houchens v. Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consuella Caudill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wayne Houchens
Represented By: Seth Daniel Scott
Represented By: Aaron Balla Houchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?