Notestein et al v. Bittrex, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Chaney, Elmer Lin, Blocktrades International, LTD, Michael Wolf, Daniel Notestein, Mathieu Gagnon, Szymon Lapinski, Adam Dodson, Daniel Hensley and Martin Lees
Defendant: J. Doe
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Bittrex, Inc. and Steemit, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: John Does 1-10
Case Number: 7:2020cv00342
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED ORDER regarding Order #58 resetting the deadline for Bittrex Inc. to file a new motion for interpleader deposit by way of surety bond to 3/12/2021; granting plaintiffs and Steemit, Inc. until 3/22/2021 to respond thereto, and Bittrex until 3/29/2021 to file any final reply brief. Any party desiring to be heard on Bittrex's motion may request same. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/24/2021. (ssm)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER setting 3/2/2021 as the deadline for Bittrex Inc. to file a new motion for interpleader deposit by way of surety bond; granting plaintiffs and Steemit, Inc. until 3/12/2021 to respond thereto, and Bittrex until 3/19/2021 to file any final reply brief. Any party desiring to be heard on Bittrex's motion may request same. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 02/23/2021. (ssm)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) of cryptocurrency. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/23/2021. (ssm)
February 23, 2021 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad: Status Conference held on 2/23/2021. (Court Reporter: Mary Butenschoen) (ssm)
February 16, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (CR) Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2021 01:00 PM by conference call before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Parties to notify court as to whether a court reporter is required by no later than noon, 2/22/2021. (ssm)
February 12, 2021 Filing 54 Notice of Cancellation of Motions Hearing scheduled for 2 pm on 2/16/2021 (Cancel Court Reporter) To be rescheduled on/about 2/23/2021 when availability of counsel confirmed. (ssm)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER wherein the parties Steemit and Bittrex agree to stay any responses and all motion practice, discovery, and all other proceedings in re Steemit's three counterclaims against Bittrex and whatelse as set forth in this order. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/22/2020. (ssm)
December 22, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #14 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) : (CR) Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2021 02:00 PM in via Zoom before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad, NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Advisory Jury Trial/Bench Trial tbd -set for 9/7-9/17/2021 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ssm)
December 22, 2020 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad: Scheduling Conference held on 12/22/2020. Motion For Interpleader Deposit scheduled 2/16/2021 @ 2pm, Discovery Cutoff scheduled for 7/23/2021, Dispositive Motions for 7/29/2021 and Advisory Jury/Bench Trial set for 9/7-9/17/2021 in Roanoke. Scheduling Order to follow post Feb. hearing. (ssm)
December 11, 2020 Filing 50 STIPULATION to Stay Claims and Proceedings as Between Steemit and Bittrex by Bittrex, Inc. (Martirosian, Claire)
December 9, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/22/2020 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Dial In instructions to follow nearer to hearing date. (ssm)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bittrex, Inc. answer due 12/11/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/25/2020. (ams)
November 23, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #28 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martirosian, Claire)
November 2, 2020 Filing 46 Scheduling Letter (ssm)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Responsive Pleading Bittrex, Inc. answer due 11/24/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/29/2020. (ssm)
October 27, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex Proposed Order)(Hollon, Gregory)
October 22, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Kevane on behalf of Steemit, Inc. (Kevane, Catherine)
October 22, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Dicke on behalf of Steemit, Inc. (Dicke, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey O'Neill on behalf of Steemit, Inc. (O'Neill, Casey)
October 21, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer C. Bretan on behalf of Steemit, Inc. (Bretan, Jennifer)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #32 MOTION for Jennifer C. Bretan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/14/2020. (ams)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #31 MOTION for Catherine Kevane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/14/2020. (ams)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 MOTION for Casey O'Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/14/2020. (ams)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #30 MOTION for Michael S. Dicke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/14/2020. (ams)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bittrex, Inc. answer due 10/27/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/9/2020. (ams)
October 8, 2020 Filing 34 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #28 Answer to Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottenborn, John)
October 6, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Casey O'Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3493133. by Steemit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finney, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Jennifer C. Bretan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3493128. by Steemit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finney, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Catherine Kevane to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3493117. by Steemit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finney, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Michael S. Dicke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3493111. by Steemit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Finney, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 29 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steemit, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Steemit Ltd. for Steemit, Inc.. (Finney, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, COUNTERCLAIM against Bittrex, Inc. by Steemit, Inc..(Finney, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Blocktrades International, LTD, Andrew Chaney, Adam Dodson, Mathieu Gagnon, Daniel Hensley, Szymon Lapinski, Martin Lees, Elmer Lin, Daniel Notestein, Michael Wolf. (Derrico, Michelle)
September 22, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 15, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 (Declaration of Claire Martirosian), #2 (Exhibit A to Declaration of Claire Martirosian))(Rottenborn, John)
September 1, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Blocktrades International, LTD, Andrew Chaney, Adam Dodson, Mathieu Gagnon, Daniel Hensley, Szymon Lapinski, Martin Lees, Elmer Lin, Daniel Notestein, Michael Wolf. (Derrico, Michelle)
September 1, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Blocktrades International, LTD, Andrew Chaney, Adam Dodson, Mathieu Gagnon, Daniel Hensley, Szymon Lapinski, Martin Lees, Elmer Lin, Daniel Notestein, Michael Wolf.(Derrico, Michelle)
August 25, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) . filed by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support (Second Declaration of Kevin Hamilton), #2 Declaration in Support (Supplemental Declaration of Claire Martirosian), #3 Exhibit (Ex. A to Supplemental Declaration of Claire Martirosian))(Rottenborn, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Bittrex, Inc. re #21 Notice of Filing Amended Counterclaims and Amended Third Party Claims (Rottenborn, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, , Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Steemit, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM (Amended Counterclaim) against All Plaintiffs by Bittrex, Inc..(Rottenborn, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) . filed by Blocktrades International, LTD, Andrew Chaney, Adam Dodson, Mathieu Gagnon, Daniel Hensley, Szymon Lapinski, Martin Lees, Elmer Lin, Daniel Notestein, Michael Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Declaration in Support, #3 Declaration in Support, #4 Declaration in Support, #5 Declaration in Support, #6 Declaration in Support, #7 Declaration in Support, #8 Declaration in Support, #9 Declaration in Support)(Derrico, Michelle) (Attachment 7 replaced on 8/21/2020) (ams). Modified on 8/21/2020 (ams).Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Greg J. Hollon for Bittrex, Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/5/2020. (aab)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Claire Martirosian for Bittrex, Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/5/2020. (aab)
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. filed by Blocktrades International, LTD, Andrew Chaney, Adam Dodson, Mathieu Gagnon, Daniel Hensley, Szymon Lapinski, Martin Lees, Elmer Lin, Daniel Notestein, Michael Wolf. (Derrico, Michelle)
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 Responsive Pleadings ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Blocktrades International, LTD, Andrew Chaney, Adam Dodson, Mathieu Gagnon, Daniel Hensley, Szymon Lapinski, Martin Lees, Elmer Lin, Daniel Notestein, Michael Wolf.(Derrico, Michelle)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) . filed by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support (Declaration of Julian Yap), #2 Declaration in Support (Declaration of Kevin Hamilton), #3 Declaration in Support (Declaration of Claire Martirosian))(Rottenborn, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Bittrex, Inc.. (Rottenborn, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Claire Martirosian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3453813. by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottenborn, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Greg J. Hollon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3453812. by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottenborn, John)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bittrex, Inc.. Steemit, Inc. waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020.(Rottenborn, John)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bittrex, Inc. answer due 7/15/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 07/21/2020. (ams)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Steemit, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ams)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for Steemit, Inc. by Bittrex, Inc. (Rottenborn, John)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Steemit, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Bittrex, Inc..(Rottenborn, John)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bittrex, Inc. (Rottenborn, John)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottenborn, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of service of Bittrex, Inc. on June 18, 2020 upon CT Corporation, Registered Agent(Derrico, Michelle)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bittrex, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ams)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blocktrades International, LTD. (ams)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bittrex, Inc., and J. Doe (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 receipt # 0423-3414830), filed by Mathieu Gagnon, Martin Lees, Andrew Chaney, Michael Wolf, Daniel Notestein, Blocktrades International, LTD, Adam Dodson, Daniel Hensley, Szymon Lapinski, and Elmer Lin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Notestein et al v. Bittrex, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Chaney
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Lin
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blocktrades International, LTD
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wolf
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Notestein
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathieu Gagnon
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Szymon Lapinski
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Dodson
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hensley
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Lees
Represented By: Richard L. Derrico
Represented By: Michelle C. F. Derrico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Bittrex, Inc.
Represented By: Claire Martirosian
Represented By: Gregory Jude Hollon
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Steemit, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John Finney
Represented By: Jennifer C. Bretan
Represented By: Casey O'Neill
Represented By: Michael S. Dicke
Represented By: Catherine Kevane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?