Boxley v. Rockingham County Jail, Harrisonburg
Plaintiff: Earl Boxley
Defendant: Rockingham County Jail, Harrisonburg
Case Number: 7:2020cv00413
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: re #10 Memorandum Opinion, #11 Order Dismissing Case regarding Earl Boxley; (No forwarding address given) (aab)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/21/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/21/2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: re #8 Response regarding Earl Boxley; (No forwarding address given) (aab)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 Response re #7 NOTICE of Future Change of Address .. (slt) Modified on 8/11/2020-corrected docket text. (slt).
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Future Change of Address by Earl Boxley. (slt) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/11/2020 with correct pdf.) (slt).
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Earl Boxley (slt)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 7/16/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00776. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2020 Case transferred to Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division. ORDERED that plaintiff direct all future filings to the Clerks Office for the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia, Harrisonburg Division (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/16/20. (c/m on 7/16/20)(klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (c/m on 7/15/20) (klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Rockingham County Jail Harrisonburg, filed by Earl Boxley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Prisoner data)(klau, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boxley v. Rockingham County Jail, Harrisonburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockingham County Jail, Harrisonburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Boxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?